Person ? A. O. Crichton
- From 1917-01-01 to 1917-12-31, Administrateur of UNITED RAILWAYS OF THE HAVANA AND REGLA WAREHOUSES, LIMITED
- From 1923-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of UNITED RAILWAYS OF THE HAVANA AND REGLA WAREHOUSES, LIMITED
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Conseiller de surveillance of UNITED RAILWAYS OF THE HAVANA AND REGLA WAREHOUSES, LIMITED
- From 1945-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of UNITED RAILWAYS OF THE HAVANA AND REGLA WAREHOUSES, LIMITED