Person ? E. Dubonnet
- From 1923-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of ETABLISSEMENTS OROSDI-BACK
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of Vinicole de Champagne
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Membre du Comité de surveillance of SOCIÉTÉ GAVEAU ET Cie
- From 1940-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur of Vinicole de Champagne
- From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Membre du conseil de surveillance of SOCIÉTÉ GAVEAU ET Cie
- From 1948-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Président of DUBONNET
- From 1948-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Membre du Comité de surveillance of SOCIÉTÉ GAVEAU ET Cie