Data for Financial History
Stock Exchanges
Issuers
Persons
(current)
Use DFIH Data
About
Publications
Team
Wiki
Sign in
Person
?
H. Ponnier
H. Ponnier
From 1923-01-01 to 1927-12-31,
Administrateur
of
SOCIÉTÉ GAVEAU ET Cie
From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Membre du conseil de surveillance
of
SOCIÉTÉ GAVEAU ET Cie
Report an issue on this page