Person ? R. Annan
- From 1927-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of CAMP BIRD LIMITED
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Administrateur of CONSOLIDATED GOLDFIELDS OF SOUTH AFRICA Ltd
- From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Président of CONSOLIDATED GOLDFIELDS OF SOUTH AFRICA Ltd
- From 1948-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of THE BRITISH SOUTH AFRICA COMPANY (CHARTERED)
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Président of CONSOLIDATED GOLDFIELDS OF SOUTH AFRICA Ltd