Person ? R. Bénard
- From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of FELIX POTIN
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of "SAINT-DIDIER" AUTOMOBILES
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Vice-Président of SOCIETE FRANÇAISE CINECHROMATIQUE (Procédés R. Berthon)