Person ? P. Dugueyt
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of COMPAGNIE DES MINES D'ARRENS
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE FRANÇAISE CINECHROMATIQUE (Procédés R. Berthon)
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Administrateur of SOPARA (Société de Participations de Rayonne)