Person ? Ville de Mulhouse
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of ENERGIE ELECTRIQUE DU RHIN (Usine de Kembs)
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Administrateur of ENERGIE ELECTRIQUE DU RHIN (Usine de Kembs)
- From 1940-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of UNION ELECTRIQUE DU RHIN (Uner)
- From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Administrateur of ENERGIE ELECTRIQUE DU RHIN (Usine de Kembs)