Person
?
sir Dougal O. Malcolm
-
From 1917-01-01 to 1927-12-31,
Administrateur of THE BRITISH SOUTH AFRICA COMPANY (CHARTERED)
-
From 1927-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of CONSOLIDATED GOLDFIELDS OF SOUTH AFRICA Ltd
-
From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of THE BRITISH SOUTH AFRICA COMPANY (CHARTERED)
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31,
Administrateur of CONSOLIDATED GOLDFIELDS OF SOUTH AFRICA Ltd
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1948-12-31,
Administrateur of RHODESIAN ANGLO-AMERICAN LIMITED
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1953-12-31,
Président of THE BRITISH SOUTH AFRICA COMPANY (CHARTERED)
-
From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31,
Administrateur of ROAN ANTELOPE COPPER MINES LIMITED
-
From 1945-01-01 to 1948-12-31,
Administrateur of CONSOLIDATED GOLDFIELDS OF SOUTH AFRICA Ltd
-
From 1948-01-01 to 1948-12-31,
Administrateur of ROAN ANTELOPE COPPER MINES LIMITED
-
From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31,
Administrateur of ROAN ANTELOPE COPPER MINES LIMITED
-
From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31,
Administrateur of DE BEERS CONSOLIDATED MINES
-
From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31,
Administrateur of CONSOLIDATED GOLDFIELDS OF SOUTH AFRICA Ltd