Person ? Charles Farodeau
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Commissaire des comptes of Société Générale Alsacienne de Banque
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Commissaire des comptes of SOCIETE CENTRALE DES USINES A PAPIER " CENPA"
- From 1940-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Commissaire des comptes of ELECTRICITE DE STRASBOURG
- From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Commissaire des comptes of SOCIETE ALSACIENNE DES CARBURANTS
- From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Commissaire des comptes adjoint of GRANDS MOULINS DE PANTIN-PARIS
- From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Commissaire des comptes of GRANDS MOULINS DE STRASBOURG
- From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Commissaire des comptes of Société Générale Alsacienne de Banque
- From 1945-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Commissaire des comptes of BANQUE DE LA GUYANE
- From 1948-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Notaire of Société Générale Alsacienne de Banque